Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Highway Worker Safety
Sponsored by
Delegate Barve
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from committing certain acts while operating a motor vehicle in a highway work zone or on a bridge or highway that is under construction if a highway worker is present; providing that a person may not be convicted for a violation under the Act if the violation was due to a mechanical failure of the vehicle or the negligence of a highway worker or another person; establishing certain penalties for certain violations of the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Highway Worker Safety
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Highway Worker Safety
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-201 )
(   16-402, 21-802.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM