Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Development of Supplemental Facilities to Benefit Camden Yards
Sponsored by
Chair, Appropriations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Stadium Authority)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Stadium Authority to prepare certain studies and, subject to the approval of the Board of Public Works, develop certain supplemental facilities and supplemental facility sites within Baltimore City that directly or indirectly benefit the sports facilities at Camden Yards; requiring certain notice to the governing body of Baltimore City; authorizing the Authority to issue certain bonds; establishing the Supplemental Facilities Fund to pay expenses related to a supplemental facility; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (138-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (137-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (138-0) 41
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (137-0) 41
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Referred Appropriations 41
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Stadium Authority - Development of Supplemental Facilities to Benefit Camden Yards
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing canceled
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47
Text - Third - Maryland Stadium Authority - Development of Supplemental Facilities to Benefit Camden Yards
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 48A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 47A
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Adopted 57
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221
Text - Chapter - Maryland Stadium Authority - Development of Supplemental Facilities to Benefit Camden Yards
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-601, 10-620, 10-622.1 through 10-622.5, 10-628, 10-657.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM