Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Duties and Reports - Revisions
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health)
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the information required to be included in the annual report to be submitted to certain persons by the Health Services Cost Review Commission to include an update on the status of the State's compliance with the provisions of the current all-payer model contract; altering a certain reporting date from October 1 to May 1; authorizing the Commission, on request by the Secretary of Health, to assist in the implementation of federally approved model programs consistent with the current all-payer model contract; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted (134-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {436088/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted (134-0) 42
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 42
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Health Services Cost Review Commission - Duties and Reports - Revisions
House 3/13/2019 3/14/2019 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments {436088/1 Adopted 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Text - Third - Health Services Cost Review Commission - Duties and Reports - Revisions
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 57
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Referred Rules 59
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Hershey) Adopted 63
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Hershey) Adopted 64
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-201, 19-207, 19-214, 19-219 )
(   15-604 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM