Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Apprentice Hunting License - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates McMillan, Clark, Holmes, Jacobs, Jalisi, and Stein
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing an apprentice hunting license that confers specified rights on a purchaser of the license; authorizing a person to obtain an apprentice hunting license on satisfactory completion of a short online or electronic course of instruction in competency in firearms and hunter safety approved by the Department of Natural Resources; authorizing specified persons to hunt under an apprentice license only if accompanied and directly supervised by a person who is at least 18 years old and has a valid resident nonapprentice hunting license; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1223 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - Apprentice Hunting License - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {320814/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/17 (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Apprentice Hunting License - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-2)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {994035/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Natural Resources - Apprentice Hunting License - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources - Apprentice Hunting License - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Natural Resources - Apprentice Hunting License - Establishment
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {320814/1 Adopted 47
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Motion Special Order until 03/17 (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted 47
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Apprentice Hunting License - Establishment
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (134-2) 51
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46A
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments {994035/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Natural Resources - Apprentice Hunting License - Establishment
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources - Apprentice Hunting License - Establishment
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM