Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Income Tax Overpayments - Local Reserve Account Repayment - Forgiveness
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Fennell, Adams, Anderton, D. Barnes, Beitzel, Frush, Ghrist, McComas, McKay, Sanchez, Tarlau, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, Afzali, Ali, Buckel, Ebersole, Hixson, Hornberger, C. Howard, Kaiser, Long, Luedtke, Mautz, Patterson, Reilly, Rose, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Turner, Walker, M. Washington, and Wilkins
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 698
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that a county or municipal corporation that receives an overpayment of local income tax revenue reimburse the Local Reserve Account; repealing a requirement that the Comptroller withhold the amount specified counties or municipal corporations owe to the account from specified distributions; stating that it is the intent of the General Assembly that the Comptroller return from the Local Reserve Account any reimbursement payment made by a county or municipal corporation under specified provisions of law; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0397
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {965669/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 698
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Local Income Tax Overpayments - Local Reserve Account Repayment - Forgiveness
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable with Amendments {965669/1 Adopted 45
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Local Income Tax Overpayments - Local Reserve Account Repayment - Forgiveness
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 46A
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 45
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 52
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 698
Text - Chapter - Local Income Tax Overpayments - Local Reserve Account Repayment - Forgiveness
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM