Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Financing Statements - Correction of Records
Sponsored by
Delegate Arora
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing a specified individual who believes that a record indexed in a filing office relating to a financing statement is false or inaccurate to file a specified information statement; authorizing a specified individual to petition a specified circuit court to show cause why a specified record should not be declared invalid; requiring a specified petition to contain specified information; authorizing a show cause order to be granted ex parte; establishing requirements for an order to show cause; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/24/2014 2/26/2014 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM