Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Lot Release - Demonstrated Financial Hardship
Sponsored by
Delegate Kach
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation to grant a 5-year extension for the time frame for receiving a nontransferable building permit if a landowner or child of a landowner demonstrates financial hardship; and exempting a lot owner granted an extension for demonstrated financial hardship from the requirement to reconvey a lot under specified circumstances.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/24/2014 2/26/2014 Rereferred to Environmental Matters
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-513 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM