Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Disabled Reduced Fare Program - Opioid Treatment Program Patients
Sponsored by
Delegates Wells, Bridges, Cardin, Charkoudian, Kipke, Lehman, and Mosby
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to make available to opioid treatment programs monthly transit passes that are for use by patients of opioid treatment programs who qualify for the administration's Disabled Reduced Fare Program and may be issued to patients on site at opioid treatment programs by staff; requiring the passes to be made available at a reduced price that reflects the price of a monthly pass issued under the Disabled Reduced Fare Program as of October 1, 2020; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0705
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Transit Administration - Disabled Reduced Fare Program - Opioid Treatment Program Patients
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/12/2020 4:10 PM