Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Calculation of Credit for Dwelling Purchased by First-Time Homeowner
Sponsored by
Delegate Long
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a first-time homeowner in the State to calculate the homestead property tax credit for property that includes a newly purchased dwelling using a certain method; requiring that the credit for a newly purchased dwelling be calculated in a certain manner; providing that a certain homeowner may receive the larger of the homestead property tax credit amounts as calculated using certain methods; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Homestead Property Tax Credit - Calculation of Credit for Dwelling Purchased by First-Time Homeowner
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM