Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Clerks of the Courts - Traffic Fines - Installment Payments
Sponsored by
Delegate Vallario
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 792
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing the District Court or a circuit court to authorize the clerk of the court to approve an individual installment plan agreement for the payment of certain fines for traffic offenses under certain circumstances; authorizing a certain defendant to apply to the clerk of the court to make certain installment payments; requiring the clerk of the court to notify the Motor Vehicle Administration if a defendant fails to make an installment payment; providing for the content and posting of certain agreements; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Clerks of the Courts - Traffic Fines - Installment Payments
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {232218/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Clerks of the Courts - Traffic Fines - Installment Payments
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 792
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Clerks of the Courts - Traffic Fines - Installment Payments
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Clerks of the Courts - Traffic Fines - Installment Payments
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments {232218/1 Adopted 46
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Clerks of the Courts - Traffic Fines - Installment Payments
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 47A
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48B
Senate 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable Adopted 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Second Reading Passed 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 67
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 792
Text - Chapter - Clerks of the Courts - Traffic Fines - Installment Payments
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   26-204, 27-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM