Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Food Stamp Program - Time Limit Waiver - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Parrott, Cassilly, Krebs, McComas, McMillan, Metzgar, and Morgan
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the State from applying for or implementing a federal waiver of the time limit on the receipt of benefits under the food stamp program by an able-bodied adult without dependents who does not meet specified work requirements.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page