Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of the Environment – Office of Recycling – Recycling Market Development
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of Recycling in the Department of the Environment to promote the development of markets for recycled materials and recycled products in the State in a certain manner; requiring that the annual Maryland solid waste management and diversion report be submitted to the General Assembly by September 1, 2021, and each year thereafter, and include certain activities; requiring the Office to coordinate certain activities with certain entities; requiring certain departments to report certain information to the Office; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {540319/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Department of the Environment – Office of Recycling – Recycling Market Development
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {540319/1 Adopted 46
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Department of the Environment – Office of Recycling – Recycling Market Development
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 47
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/4/2020 5:21 PM