Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2018
Sponsored by
Delegates Frick, Glenn, Ali, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Beidle, Brooks, Carr, Chang, Clippinger, Cullison, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gaines, Gibson, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Hayes, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Jalisi, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Knotts, Korman, Kramer, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Mosby, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Proctor, Queen, Reznik, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Sophocleus, Stein, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing certain criteria for qualified offshore wind projects applied for on or after January 1, 2020; altering and extending the minimum required percentage of energy that must be derived from Tier 1 renewable sources in the State's renewable energy portfolio standard in certain years; altering and extending the minimum required percentage of Tier 1 renewable energy that must be derived from solar energy in the State's renewable energy portfolio standard in certain years; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0732
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018, January 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2018
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-708.1, 11-709 )
(   7-701, 7-703, 7-704, 7-704.1, 7-704.2, 7-705, 7-714 )
(   9-20B-01, 9-20B-05 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM