Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Howard County - Transfer Tax - Rate Increase Authorization Ho. Co. 26-20
Sponsored by
Howard County Delegation
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting moderate income housing units from a certain tax; authorizing the County Council of Howard County to increase the rate of the transfer tax to support certain public purposes; requiring the Director of Finance of Howard County to collect and distribute in certain amounts transfer tax proceeds attributable to an increase in the tax rate to the county general fund to be used for certain purposes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {505767/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-5)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Howard County - Transfer Tax - Rate Increase Authorization Ho. Co. 26-20
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {505767/1 Adopted 47
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Howard County - Transfer Tax - Rate Increase Authorization Ho. Co. 26-20
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (126-5) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 49
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 52
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20.300, 20.301, 20.304 )
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 9:02 AM