Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreement MC/PG 118-13
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 687
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission to enter into an agreement for payment in lieu of specified property taxes with the owner of a facility for the generation of electricity that locates in Prince George's County; requiring that a payment in lieu of taxes agreement include specified provisions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {555262/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {109230/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 687
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/20/2013 2/21/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/05/2013 3/06/2013 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments {555262/1 Report Adopted 51
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 52
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation 52
Senate 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {109230/1 Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 64
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 687
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-309 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM