Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Apprenticeship and Training Council - Apprentice Ratios - Electrical Craft or Trade
Sponsored by
Delegate McCray
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Apprenticeship and Training Council, on or before October 1, 2018, to adopt regulations establishing a ratio of journeyworkers to apprentices employed in the electrical craft or trade; prohibiting the Council from establishing a ratio less than a specified amount; requiring an employer in the electrical craft or trade to comply with specified regulations; requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to investigate a specified suspected violation under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Apprentice Ratios - Electrical Craft or Trade
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM