Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Maryland Department of Health - Pay Rates and Staffing Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Acevero, Bridges, Chang, Charles, W. Fisher, Forbes, Haynes, Hettleman, Ivey, M. Jackson, Korman, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Proctor, Reznik, Solomon, Terrasa, Turner, Wells, Wilkins, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring that the pay rate for certain employees at Clifton T. Perkins Hospital be at least two grades higher than the employee's pay rate effective June 30, 2020; requiring that the pay rate for certain employees in the Behavioral Health Administration or the Developmental Disabilities Administration be equal to the pay rate effective on July 1, 2020, for similarly trained, qualified, or licensed employees at Clifton T. Perkins Hospital under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0693
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Personnel - Maryland Department of Health - Pay Rates and Staffing Requirements
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/13/2020 3:01 PM