Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsored by
Baltimore County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding Baltimore County to the provisions of law relating to the Cecil County, Garrett County, and St. Mary's County Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1070
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {174061/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/22/2013 2/25/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/05/2013 3/06/2013 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable with Amendments {174061/1 Report Adopted 60
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 61
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 First Reading Senate Rules 61
Senate 4/04/2013 4/04/2013 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2013 4/04/2013 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM