Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Boarding Education Programs for At-Risk Youth - Eligibility
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Washington, Luedtke, Patterson, Turner, and M. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 324
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a residential boarding education program for students enrolled in grade 7 or higher; providing that specified students shall be eligible to participate in the program if the students are disadvantaged children, at-risk youth, and residents of the State and if an operator files a specified plan; requiring operators of the program to meet specified qualifications, adopt specified standards, conduct specified outreach programs, provide specified information, and encourage student participation; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0595
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 324
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Residential Boarding Education Programs for At-Risk Youth - Eligibility
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43
Text - Third - Residential Boarding Education Programs for At-Risk Youth - Eligibility
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 45
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation 44
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 324
Text - Chapter - Residential Boarding Education Programs for At-Risk Youth - Eligibility
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-701, 8-702, 8-703, 8-704, 8-704.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM