Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2008 - Baltimore County - The Emmart-Pierpoint Safe House
Sponsored by
Delegate Jones
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 458
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2008 to alter the purpose for which a specified grant may be used; changing the name of a grantee from the Emmart-Pierpoint Safe House to the Friends of Historical Cherry Hill Church AUMP for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, reconstruction, renovation, restoration, and capital equipping of the Cherry Hill Church, located in Baltimore County; making the Act an emergency measure; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {154867/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-6)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {429037/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (111-23)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 458
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/20/2014 2/21/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/10/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Favorable with Amendments {154867/1 Report Adopted 45
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Third Reading Passed (127-6) 46
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation 45
Senate 3/14/2014 3/14/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments {429037/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 63
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 70
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 Third Reading Passed (111-23) 70
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 Passed Enrolled 70
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 458
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2008, 2009 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM