Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an action for repossession for failure to pay rent to contain a statement on whether the property is an affected property under specified lead-based paint abatement laws; requiring a court to dismiss an action for repossession for failure to pay rent that does not include specified information concerning the affected property; altering specified time frames for scheduling a trial date and serving a summons; authorizing a court to adjourn a specified trial to obtain documents or other proof of a claim or defense; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {620314/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-42)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments {620314/1 Adopted 50
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (97-42) 51
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46A
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM