Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Service, Stipends, and Scholarships - Maryland Corps Program - Established
Sponsored by
Delegates Hettleman, Anderson, Atterbeary, B. Barnes, Barron, Chang, Clippinger, Ebersole, Frick, Gaines, Hayes, Haynes, Hill, Jackson, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Lafferty, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, McIntosh, Morhaim, Platt, Reznik, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Smith, Sydnor, Valderrama, M. Washington, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Corps Program; providing for stipends of up to $15,000 for corps participants and one-time scholarships of up to $6,000 for corps participants who complete the Program; requiring the Board of Directors to issue a Request for Proposals for an operator for the Program on or before June 1, 2017, that includes specified elements and expectations; providing that funds for the Program will be as provided in the State budget in specified fiscal years for specified purposes; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0909
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {214460/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (88-46)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-8)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {214460/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (88-46) 49
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance 47A
Senate 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (38-8) 61
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-103, 24-1101 through 24-1111 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM