Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Juvenile Services Education System - Establishment, Powers, and Duties
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Bartlett, Clippinger, Crutchfield, Ebersole, Fennell, Ivey, and Moon
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing certain provisions of law regarding educational programs for juveniles in residential facilities; establishing a Juvenile Services Education System; establishing the Board of Education for the Juvenile Services Education System; requiring the Board to have the authority and responsibility for all functions relating to the juvenile services educations programs in the State beginning July 1, 2021; requiring each county board of education to pay to the Board a certain cost for certain juveniles; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0798
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary
Text - First - Education - Juvenile Services Education System - Establishment, Powers, and Duties
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/18/2020 8:10 AM