Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel and Pensions - Maryland Whistleblower Law - Department of Juvenile Services Employees
Sponsored by
Delegates Feldmark, Acevero, Barron, Cain, Carr, Ebersole, Guyton, Ivey, R. Lewis, Love, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Shetty, Stewart, Terrasa, Washington, Wilkins, and P. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 483
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Juvenile Services to take certain actions related to certain protections and remedies for certain employees; prohibiting a supervisor, appointing authority, or the head of a principal unit of State government from taking or refusing to take any personnel action or reprisal against an employee of the Department of Juvenile Services who discloses certain information to the Director of Juvenile Justice Monitoring or staff of the Juvenile Justice Monitoring Unit; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 483
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Personnel and Pensions - Maryland Whistleblower Law - Department of Juvenile Services Employees
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48A
Text - Third - State Personnel and Pensions - Maryland Whistleblower Law - Department of Juvenile Services Employees
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 49A
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Finance 51
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53C
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 483
Text - Chapter - State Personnel and Pensions - Maryland Whistleblower Law - Department of Juvenile Services Employees
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 3:44 PM