Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Opioid-Exposed Newborns and Parents Addicted to Opioids - Mobile Application - Pilot Program (I'm Alive Today App)
Sponsored by
Delegate McKay
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Social Services Administration, in consultation with the local departments of social services, to establish a pilot program in Allegany, Garrett, and Washington counties to communicate with a certain opioid-addicted parent through a mobile application; requiring the local departments of social services in Allegany, Garrett, and Washington counties, if appropriate, to communicate with a certain opioid-addicted parent through a certain mobile application under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Opioid-Exposed Newborns and Parents Addicted to Opioids - Mobile Application - Pilot Program (I'm Alive Today App)
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/12/2020 3:40 PM