Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Wells, Attar, Boyce, Harrison, Healey, Holmes, Jalisi, Lehman, Lierman, Love, Ruth, Stewart, and Terrasa
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Urban Agriculture Grant Program in the Department of Agriculture to increase the viability of urban farming and improve access to urban-grown foods; establishing an Urban Agriculture Grant Fund to provide grants to nonprofit organizations in Baltimore City to implement the Program; requiring the Secretary of Agriculture to administer the Fund; authorizing the distribution of up to $400,000 to the Fund for each of fiscal years 2022 and 2025; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {260418/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
51A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Program
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {260418/1 Adopted 49
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Program
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 50
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 51A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-2001 through 2-2005 )
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:32 AM