Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Education – Title IX – Policies and Procedures (Hear Our Voices Act of 2020)
Sponsored by
Delegates J. Lewis, Cain, D.M. Davis, W. Fisher, Healey, Henson, and Mosby
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education, on or before March 31, 2021, to develop policies and procedures for reporting, administering, investigating, and resolving complaints related to incidents of sexual misconduct and Title IX; providing for the requirements of the policies and procedures; and requiring the State Board to adopt regulations to implement the Act.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Education – Title IX – Policies and Procedures (Hear Our Voices Act of 2020)
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-446 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:39 PM