Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment – General Contractor Liability for Unpaid Wages
Sponsored by
Delegates Lisanti, Barkley, Branch, Brooks, Carey, Clippinger, Fennell, Glenn, Valderrama, and Waldstreicher
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 846
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that certain general contractors are jointly and severally liable for certain violations of the wage payment and collection law by a subcontractor regardless of whether the subcontractor is in a direct contractual relationship with the general contractor; requiring a subcontractor to indemnify a general contractor for certain wages, damages, interest, penalties, and fees except under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0853
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {213698/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/26 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {433220/1 (Delegate Jacobs) Rejected (48-87)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/27 (Delegate Long) Rejected (48-87)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Labor and Employment – General Contractor Liability for Unpaid Wages
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted (93-47)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (87-53)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-13)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 846
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Labor and Employment – General Contractor Liability for Unpaid Wages (Contractors Payment Protection Act)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/23/2018 3/18/2018 Favorable with Amendments {213698/1 Adopted 52A
House 3/23/2018 3/18/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/26 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 52A
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Floor Amendment {433220/1 (Delegate Jacobs) Rejected (48-87) 53
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/27 (Delegate Long) Rejected (48-87) 53
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
Text - Third - Labor and Employment – General Contractor Liability for Unpaid Wages
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted (93-47) 54
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Third Reading Passed (87-53) 54
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Referred Rules 54
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable Adopted 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (32-13) 64
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 846
Text - Chapter - Labor and Employment – General Contractor Liability for Unpaid Wages
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM