Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill - Producer Responsibility
Sponsored by
Delegates Lehman, Acevero, Boyce, Bridges, Carr, Charkoudian, Cullison, Fraser-Hidalgo, Guyton, R. Lewis, Love, Moon, Pena-Melnyk, Qi, Solomon, Terrasa, Valentino-Smith, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a producer of synthetic turf and turf infill, on or before January 1, 2021, to individually or as part of a stewardship organization submit a synthetic turf and turf infill stewardship plan to the Department of the Environment for review and approval; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill - Producer Responsibility
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Environment - Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill - Producer Responsibility
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
(   9-2301 through 9-2308 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:39 PM
Click to return on the top page