Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Placement
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Lisanti, Bagnall, B. Barnes, Barron, Bartlett, Bhandari, Carey, Chang, Crosby, Feldmark, Healey, Henson, Howard, Johnson, Kipke, Lehman, Patterson, Pendergrass, Proctor, Shetty, Szeliga, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Walker, Williams, Belcastro, Carr, Charles, Chisholm, Hill, Kerr, Krebs, R. Lewis, Morgan, Reilly, Rosenberg, Saab, and Sample-Hughes
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 490
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that the assessment of a certain fee by the State Health Services Cost Review Commission for funding the Hospital Employees Retraining Fund is to be in the case of a hospital closure, merger, or full delicensure; altering the circumstances under which hospitals are required to pay a certain fee directly to the Maryland Department of Labor; requiring certain hospitals to pay an annual direct remittance to the Department by July 1; requiring certain money from the Fund be returned to certain hospitals under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0938
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {696283/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {447371/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 490
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Placement
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {696283/1 Adopted 48
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Placement
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Referred Finance 50
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {447371/1 Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 House Concurs Senate Amendments 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Placement
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 490
Text - Chapter - Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Placement
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-223, 19-326.1 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:40 PM