Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Class B Licenses
Sponsored by
Baltimore County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 765
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore County to allow a person to obtain a certain interest in one or more licenses issued in another jurisdiction or state and a certain number of Class B beer, wine, and liquor licenses that the Board issues; repealing requirements that a certain restaurant have a minimum dining seating capacity and a certain cocktail lounge or bar seating capacity; increasing to 49% the sales in alcoholic beverages a restaurant for which a license is issued is required to have; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Class B Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {403799/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Class B Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 765
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Class B Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Class B Licenses
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/21/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable with Amendments {403799/1 Adopted 51
House 3/21/2018 3/17/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Text - Third - Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Class B Licenses
House 3/22/2018 3/18/2018 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 52
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Referred Rules 52
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable Adopted 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 64
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 765
Text - Chapter - Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Class B Licenses
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-102, 13-1606 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM