Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Massage Therapists - Licenses and Registrations - Education and Display Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Krebs
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 797
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the educational requirements to qualify for a license to practice massage therapy; altering the educational requirements to qualify to be registered to practice massage therapy; and requiring each holder of a license or registration to practice massage therapy to display the license or registration conspicuously where the holder is engaged in practice.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {876889/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-3)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {854537/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 797
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Massage Therapists - Licenses and Registrations - Education and Display Requirements
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {876889/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Massage Therapists - Licenses and Registrations - Education and Display Requirements
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (133-3) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48B
Senate 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments {854537/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-2) 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Massage Therapists - Licenses and Registrations - Education and Display Requirements
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 797
Text - Chapter - Massage Therapists - Licenses and Registrations - Education and Display Requirements
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-301, 6-302, 6-306.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM