Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Commerce - Harford Memorial Hospital Closure - Economic Impact Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Lisanti and Glass
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Commerce to conduct a study on the economic impact of the closure of Harford Memorial Hospital in Havre de Grace and the transfer of its services to another location; requiring the Department to conduct the study in a certain manner; requiring the Department to develop a revitalization plan for the City in a certain manner; requiring the Department to report certain findings and information to certain committees on or before December 1, 2018; and terminating the Act after June 30, 2019.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Department of Commerce - Harford Memorial Hospital Closure - Economic Impact Study
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM