Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - Amounts
Sponsored by
Delegates Anderton, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Mautz, Sample-Hughes, and Walker
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of certain income tax disparity grants to counties and Baltimore City under certain circumstances and for certain fiscal years; and extending a certain termination provision by 2 years.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0764
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - Amounts
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - Amounts
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-7)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - Amounts
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64
Text - Third - Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - Amounts
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (132-7) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Referred Rules 65
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM