Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Early Voting - Registered Voter Updating the Voter's Address on an Existing Registration
Sponsored by
Delegates Ali, Mosby, Turner, M. Washington, and Wilkins
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 825
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a specified provision of the election law concerning a registered voter updating the voter's address during early voting to conform to other provisions of the election law applicable to a registered voter updating the voter's address and voting; repealing the requirement that a registered voter updating the voter's address on an existing registration during early voting must provide proof of residency; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0331 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Saab) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-40)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-9)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 825
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Election Law - Early Voting - Registered Voter Updating the Voter's Address on an Existing Registration
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable Adopted 47
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Saab) Adopted 47
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed 48
Text - Third - Election Law - Early Voting - Registered Voter Updating the Voter's Address on an Existing Registration
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (99-40) 49
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46A
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (37-9) 61
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 825
Text - Chapter - Election Law - Early Voting - Registered Voter Updating the Voter's Address on an Existing Registration
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM