Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of the Attorney General – Firearm Crime, Injuries, Fatalities, and Crime Firearms – Study
Sponsored by
Delegate Clippinger
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 491
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of the Attorney General to study and identify certain information relating to certain firearm crimes, injuries, fatalities, and crime firearms; requiring all State and local law enforcement agencies and other governmental units to provide the Office of the Attorney General with all information necessary to complete the study; requiring the Office of the Attorney General to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2020, December 1, 2021, and December 1, 2022; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1047
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (130-8)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Office of the Attorney General - Firearm Crime - Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Office of the Attorney General - Firearm Crime - Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-28)
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {828075/1
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Committee Amendment {828075/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Rejected
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-15)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-28)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 491
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (130-8) 32
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Referred Judiciary 32
Text - First - Office of the Attorney General - Firearm Crime - Study
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable Adopted 45
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed 45
Text - Third - Office of the Attorney General - Firearm Crime - Study
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (106-28) 47A
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments {828075/1 52A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 52A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Committee Amendment {828075/1 Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Rejected 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted 53C
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (30-15) 53C
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 House Concurs Senate Amendments 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (100-28) 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Office of the Attorney General – Firearm Crime, Injuries, Fatalities, and Crime Firearms – Study
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 491
Text - Chapter - Office of the Attorney General – Firearm Crime, Injuries, Fatalities, and Crime Firearms – Study
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 2:07 PM