Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Sponsored by
Delegates Frick, Aumann, Barkley, Barve, Carr, Gaines, Healey, Hettleman, Jones, Lierman, Pendergrass, Reznik, Stein, Turner, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "unfair or deceptive trade practice" to be "unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice"; providing the purpose of the Act is to support enforcement by and funding of the Office of the Attorney General and the Commissioner of Financial Regulation to protect State residents when conducting financial transactions and receiving certain services; requiring the Commissioner to designate an individual as the Student Loan Ombudsman; requiring the establishment of a student loan borrower education course; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1068
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {233198/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (87-46)
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {417178/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {877771/1 (Finance Committee)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Waugh) Rejected (14-29)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {877771/1 (Finance Committee) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (32-12)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-42)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments {233198/1 Adopted 46
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Third Reading Passed (87-46) 47A
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments {417178/1 Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Floor Amendment {877771/1 (Finance Committee) 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Waugh) Rejected (14-29) 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Floor Amendment {877771/1 (Finance Committee) Adopted 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (32-12) 63
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (93-42) 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731
Text - Chapter - Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-101, 7-205 )
(   13-101, 13-301, 13-303, 13-410, 14-202, 14-4101 through 14-4104 )
(   11-201, 11-504, 11-517, 11-602, 11-615, 12-105, 12-126, 12-405, 12-426, 12-906, 12-928, 2-104.1, 2-115, 2-116 )
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:42 PM