Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission - Reporting and Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Bartlett, and Lehman
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Synopsis
Extending the time for the submission of the interim report to September 1, 2021, and for the final report to December 1, 2022, of the Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission and extending the termination date for the Commission.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission - Reporting and Sunset Extension
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/14/2020 12:10 PM