Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Collaborative Care Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Morales, Pendergrass, Bromwell, Angel, Barron, Cullison, Hill, Kelly, Miele, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 684
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Collaborative Care Pilot Program in the Maryland Department of Health to implement a Collaborative Care Model in primary care settings to provide health care services to recipients enrolled in HealthChoice; requiring the Department to select up to three sites for the Pilot Program; requiring the Department to work with stakeholders on the development, implementation, and outcome monitoring of the Program; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget $550,000 for certain fiscal years; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0835
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Collaborative Care Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {646781/2 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Collaborative Care Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 684
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Collaborative Care Pilot Program
House 4/04/2018 4/05/2018 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments {646781/2 Adopted 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Collaborative Care Pilot Program
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Referred Rules 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Adopted 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Second Reading Passed 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 67
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 684
Text - Chapter - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Collaborative Care Pilot Program
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM