Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation – Pride of Baltimore II – Funding and Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegate McIntosh
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include in the State budget for fiscal years 2020 through 2023, an appropriation of $500,000 from the Transportation Trust Fund for the operation of the replica sailing vessel known as the Pride of Baltimore II; requiring a person or entity receiving funds under the Act to submit a report to the Department of Transportation and certain committees of the General Assembly on the expenditure of funds and on information demonstrating that the Pride was operated solely for certain purposes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1206
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transportation - Pride of Baltimore II - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {484361/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Transportation – Pride of Baltimore II – Funding and Reporting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (113-22)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Transportation - Pride of Baltimore II - Funding
House 3/02/2018 3/05/2018 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments {484361/1 Adopted 60
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Text - Third - Transportation – Pride of Baltimore II – Funding and Reporting
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (113-22) 61
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Referred Rules 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM