Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Rescission of Maryland's Ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States Constitution
Sponsored by
Delegates Anderson, Carter, and Vallario
Status
In the Senate - Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Rescinding Maryland's ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States Constitution.
Details
Cross-filed with: SJ0001
Bill File Type: Regular
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/09/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {963523/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/08/2014 1/09/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Favorable with Amendments {963523/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 66
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 62
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM