Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Agriculture - Spay/Neuter Fund - Extension and Report
Sponsored by
Delegates Lehman, Attar, Bagnall, Bartlett, Crutchfield, Forbes, Johnson, D. Jones, Krimm, McComas, Ruth, Solomon, Terrasa, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Agriculture to report to the General Assembly by October 1, 2021, on spay and neuter programs that are not receiving funding from the Spay/Neuter Fund, the market capacity for increasing the fees assessed on each brand name or product name commercial feed, and a proposed fee structure to enhance the revenue generated from certain assessed fees; and extending the termination date to September 30, 2032, for provisions of law relating to the Fund.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/15/2020
Legislative Date
10/15/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {120016/1 Adopted
Proceedings
10AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
10AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Department of Agriculture - Spay/Neuter Fund - Extension and Report
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (120-9)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/15/2020 10/15/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 1:30 p.m.
House 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing canceled
House 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing 1/29 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Department of Agriculture - Spay/Neuter Fund - Extension and Fee on Commercial Feed
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {120016/1 Adopted 10AClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 10AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Agriculture - Spay/Neuter Fund - Extension and Report
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Third Reading Passed (120-9) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/24/2021 10:00 AM
Click to return on the top page