Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real-Time Transparency Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 3:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a political committee to file a contribution report within 48 hours after receiving a single contribution, transfer, or loan of $1,000 or more during the year of an election in which the political committee is participating; requiring contribution reports to include specified information; providing that contribution reports filed by a political committee are in addition to specified other reports filed by a political committee; providing for a $10 fee for each day or part of a day a contribution report is overdue; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0578
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0667 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
7/06/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 7/06/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/04 at 3:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
12/17/2015 Text - First - Real-Time Transparency Act of 2016
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-309.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM