Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund – Supplementary Appropriation
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Commerce to create, own, control, or be a member of a corporation, a limited liability company, a partnership, or any other entity, whether operated for profit or not for profit, for certain purposes; requiring the Department to issue a request for proposals to select a management entity to establish the Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund; authorizing the creation of State debt in a certain amount, the proceeds to be provided to the Fund to be used for certain purposes; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0117
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019, June 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/20/2018
Legislative Date
11/20/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {747774/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund – Supplementary Appropriation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-13)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation Ways and Means
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/20/2018 11/20/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {747774/1 Adopted 47A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund – Supplementary Appropriation
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (33-13) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation Ways and Means 50
House 3/26/2019 3/26/2019 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM