Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Information Act - 9-1-1 Communications - Denial of Part of a Public Record
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a custodian of records to grant inspection of part of a 9-1-1 communications record under certain circumstances after providing certain notice and considering certain information; requiring a custodian to grant or deny a certain application within a certain period of time; authorizing a custodian to redact certain information if a failure to do so would result in a constructive denial of the entire public record; requiring a custodian to allow inspection by the person in interest; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0215
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/10/2018
Legislative Date
10/10/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2019
Legislative Date
1/11/2019
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 4:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {424533/1
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {424533/1
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted (31-16)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/10/2018 10/10/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Information Act - 9-1-1 Communications - Denial of Part of a Public Record
Senate 1/11/2019 1/11/2019 Hearing 1/23 at 4:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments {424533/1 46A
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 46A
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {424533/1 47
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Committee Amendment Adopted (31-16) 47
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Public Information Act - 9-1-1 Communications - Denial of Part of a Public Record
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 50
House 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Text - Chapter - Public Information Act - 9-1-1 Communications - Denial of Part of a Public Record
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-203, 4-343, 4-356 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM