Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Implicit Bias Training and the Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities
Sponsored by
Senators Griffith, Benson, Ellis, Kelley, Washington, West, Guzzone, Feldman, Augustine, Beidle, Corderman, Eckardt, Edwards, Elfreth, King, Hayes, Klausmeier, Kramer, McCray, Peters, Rosapepe, Salling, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities to publish, to a certain extent, health data that includes race and ethnicity information collected by the Office and update the data at least once every 6 months; requiring the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2023, to include an appropriation of at least $1,788,314 in the annual budget bill for the Office; requiring the Cultural and Linguistic Health Care Professional Competency Program, to identify and approve certain implicit bias training programs; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0028
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {227475/1 Adopted
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Public Health - Implicit Bias Training and the Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments {227475/1 Adopted 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health - Implicit Bias Training and the Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities
Last Updated: 3/5/2021 2:03 PM
Click to return on the top page