Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Dorchester County - Restriction on Sunday Gaming - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senator Colburn
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a restriction that prohibits specified gaming licensees in Dorchester County from holding gaming events or carnivals on a Sunday.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0069
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1310 Session: 2012 1st Special Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
10/19/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2013
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-3)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2012 10/19/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/09/2013 1/09/2013 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 20
Senate 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Second Reading Passed 20
Senate 2/11/2013 2/11/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 22
House 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 First Reading Ways and Means 25
House 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (133-3) 62
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Returned Passed 61A
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-1202, 13-1203, 13-1204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM