Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Computer-Aided Firearm Fabrication - Prohibitions
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from using a certain computer-aided fabrication device to manufacture a firearm; prohibiting a person from possessing, selling, offering to sell, transferring, purchasing, or receiving a firearm manufactured using a certain computer-aided fabrication device; prohibiting a person from possessing, distributing, transmitting, publishing, selling, transferring, or purchasing a certain computer control language, computer program, computer software, or computer database; establishing certain penalties; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
7/30/2018
Legislative Date
7/30/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Computer-Aided Firearm Fabrication - Prohibitions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 7/30/2018 7/30/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Computer-Aided Firearm Fabrication - Prohibitions
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-204, 4-601 through 4-605, 7-302 )
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:41 PM