Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

SB0008


CH0495

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Subsequent Injury Fund and Uninsured Employers’ Fund – Assessment on Awards and Settlements – Amount
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Uninsured Employers' Fund)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 495
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the percentage, from 6.5% to 5.5%, of a certain assessment imposed by the Workers' Compensation Commission payable to the Subsequent Injury Fund; altering the percentage, from 1% to 2%, of a certain assessment imposed by the Commission payable to the Uninsured Employers' Fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/16/2019
Legislative Date
9/16/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/20/2019
Legislative Date
12/20/2019
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {377379/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted (132-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 495
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/16/2019 9/16/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/20/2019 12/20/2019 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Uninsured Employers' Fund - Additional Assessment on Awards and Settlements - Amount
Senate 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Favorable with Amendments {377379/1 Adopted 43
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Subsequent Injury Fund and Uninsured Employers’ Fund – Assessment on Awards and Settlements – Amount
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 45
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Economic Matters 46
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted 48A
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed 48A
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted (132-0) 48A
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 48A
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Returned Passed 50
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 495
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:20 PM