Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Charitable Organizations - Audit and Review
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing from $500,000 to $750,000 the minimum gross income amount by which the registration statement of a charitable organization must include an audit by an independent certified public accountant; providing a range of $300,000 but less than $750,000 of gross income amounts by which the registration statement of a charitable organization must include a specified review; and increasing the gross income amount from $500,000 to $750,000 at which the Secretary of State may require an audit or review of a charitable organization.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
7/22/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {388274/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 7/22/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {388274/1 Report Adopted 15
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 17
House 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 18
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM